HI SB2454 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the State and its political subdivisions from collecting or using a person's electronic data or metadata by means of a cell site simulator device, except under certain conditions. Prohibits the installation and use of a cell site simulator device without a court order. Specifies conditions when a cell site simulator device may be used. Specifies procedures for application and issuance of an order for a cell site simulator device. Specifies reporting requirements related to cell site simulator device applications. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Electronic Eavesdropping.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2018-02-12SenateReported from GVO/ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2206) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2018-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran.
2018-02-02SenateThe committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-06-18 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2018-02-02SenateThe committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Baker, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria.
2018-01-30SenateThe committee(s) on GVO/ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-18 2:00PM in conference room 414.
2018-01-22SenateReferred to GVO/ETT, JDC.
2018-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-01-19SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback