HI SB2440 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-04 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-04 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires facilities providing treatment for substance abuse disorders to assess a patient or client for use of all tobacco products at the time of their initial intake and take certain actions if the patient or client is determined to have a tobacco use disorder. Effective July 1, 2023.
Title
Relating To Tobacco Use Disorder Treatment.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee on HTH deferred the measure. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HTH, CPN. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Department of Health
Mandatory Tobacco Assessment
Special Treatment Facilities
Tobacco Use Disorder
Treatment
Mandatory Tobacco Assessment
Special Treatment Facilities
Tobacco Use Disorder
Treatment
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2440&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2440_.HTM |