HI SB2432 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - (S) Act 025, 4/15/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 482).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-15 - (S) Act 025, 4/15/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 482).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals law establishing the Hawaii institute for educational partnerships.
Title
Hawaii Institute for Educational Partnerships
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | (S) Act 025, 4/15/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 482). | |
2010-04-15 | (H) Act 025, on 4/15/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 237). | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 303). | |
2010-03-31 | (H) Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ching, Finnegan voting no (2) and Representative(s) Aquino, Chong, Morita, Souki excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-03-30 | (H) Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Takai, Thielen excused (2). | |
2010-03-30 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1082-10), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-03-26 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Sagum, Tokioka. | |
2010-03-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-26-10 11:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 49 | |
2010-03-05 | (H) Re-referred to HED/EDN, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Referred to HED/EBM, FIN, referral sheet 27 | |
2010-02-11 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-02-10 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 18). | |
2010-02-10 | (S) Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Tokuda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) One Day Notice 02-10-10. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) Reported from HRE/EDH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2119) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on EDH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Sakamoto, Kidani, Galuteria, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Tsutsui. | |
2010-02-04 | (S) The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Sakamoto, Kokubun, Takamine; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Slom. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HRE/EDH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-10 1:15pm in conference room 225. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Referred to HRE/EDH. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |