HI SB243 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 2:00PM in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 2:00PM in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii Western Interstate Commission of Higher Education (Hawaii WICHE). Allows Hawaii WICHE to establish a repayment policy for students who receive financial support from certain funds appropriated for the Hawaii commission. Establishes a professional student exchange program special fund. Effective July 1, 2030. (SB243 HD1)
Title
WICHE; Professional Student Exchange Program; Special Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 2:00PM in conference room 329. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-11 2:30PM in conference room 329. | |
2011-04-21 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-11 1:30PM in conference room 329. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-11 2:30PM in conference room 329. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 643). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Nishimoto, Tokioka Co-Chairs; Nakashima, Saiki, Johanson. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Tokuda, Chair; Kidani, Co-Chair(s); Taniguchi. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 438). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Awana excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1590) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-06 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-04-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-06-11 2:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Belatti, Chang, Tokioka excused (3). | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1061), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Nakashima, Aquino, Awana, Belatti, Mizuno, Saiki, Takai, Takumi, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Chang, Hanohano, Wooley, Ching. | |
2011-03-15 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 03-17-11 2:00PM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 115) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 638) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ryan ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 185) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Nishihara, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-11 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to EDU, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |