HI SB2420 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the definition of qualified applicants for selective services from male to all.
Title
Relating To The Military.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC . |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2045 (Same As) 2022-01-28 - Referred to CMV, JHA, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2420&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2420_.HTM |