HI SB2415 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to WTL/AEN, JDC.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Referred to WTL/AEN, JDC.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DLNR to transfer to DOA specified non-agricultural park lands by a specified deadline. Requires DLNR and DOA to jointly report on the status of the land transfer. Amends the definition of "agricultural activities" used in chapter 166E, HRS.
Title
Relating To Non-agricultural Park Lands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2035 (Same As) 2020-07-08 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 417).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2415&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2415_.HTM |