HI SB241 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB241

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes qualifying patients and qualifying out-of-state patients to transport cannabis between islands of the State for personal medical use. Effective 5/6/2137. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Medical Cannabis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-11HouseReferred to HHH/TRN, JHA, CPC, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 176) in amended form (SD 1).
2021-03-09SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-04Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-04SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 728) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2021-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
2021-02-12SenateReported from HTH/TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 161) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
2021-02-03SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, English, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye.
2021-02-03SenateThe committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-01-25SenateReferred to HTH/TRS, JDC.
2021-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB241 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Referred to HHH/TRN, JHA, CPC, referral sheet 22

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback