HI SB240 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB240

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Limits first offense violations of a governor's emergency proclamation requiring wearing cloth face coverings to a fine of not more than $500. Limits first offense violations of a governor's emergency proclamation requiring persons traveling from out of state to quarantine to a fine of not more than $500, except for those violators who post media of themselves violating the governor's order on social media or who travel to the State with symptoms or a positive test result for COVID-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Mask And Quarantine Violations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-08SenateThe committee on HTH deferred the measure.
2021-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-02-04SenateRe-Referred to HTH, JDC.
2021-01-25SenateReferred to PSM/HTH, JDC.
2021-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB240 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback