HI SB240 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB240
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the executive officer and chief counsel of the public utilities commission to annually file a disclosure of financial interests with the state ethics commission and requires these disclosures to be public. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Public Utilities Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 108) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Ruderman. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB240 (Carry Over) 2017-02-10 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.