HI SB2394 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - The committee on AGL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - The committee on AGL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that lands managed by the department of agriculture and the agribusiness development corporation are disposed of in a variety of sizes and to diversified tenants to support a diversified agricultural economy. Requires the department of agriculture and the agribusiness development corporation to: (1) consider the diversity of their leased or transferred lands when approving leases or transfers; and (2) submit annual reports regarding land dispositions to the legislature and to post a copy of the reports on the Internet.
Title
Department of Agriculture; Agribusiness Development Corporation; Diversified Agriculture; Leased Lands; Reporting Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | Senate | The committee on AGL deferred the measure. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-14 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to AGL/WTL, WAM. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2394&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB2394_.HTM |