HI SB2392 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for imi hoola student stipends or for other imi hoola student support programs at the discretion of the department of Native Hawaiian health of the John A. Burns school of medicine. Effective 7/1/2051. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - House - House Lower and Higher Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). |
2020-05-11 | House | Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1149-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-03-13 | House | The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Quinlan, DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson. |
2020-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Friday, 03-13-20 2:30PM in House conference room 309. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 226) in amended form (SD 1). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3382) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2020-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Shimabukuro. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-20 11:05AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2748) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-20 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Native Hawaiian Health
Imi Hoola Post-Baccalaureate Program
JABSOM
University of Hawaii
Department of Native Hawaiian Health
Imi Hoola Post-Baccalaureate Program
JABSOM
University of Hawaii