HI SB2391 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Zero to Three program coordinator position. Expands the Zero to Three court program to the Third Circuit. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To The Zero To Three Court.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2319) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |