HI SB2387 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 175, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1276).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-27 - Act 175, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1276).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires agencies to publicly post the justification for cancelling an invitation for bids or request for proposals, for a minimum of ten days, on a purchasing agency's website, government electronic notification system, or by any other means the procurement officer deems effective. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Procurement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-29 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-29 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 2 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-27 | House | Act 175, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1276). |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Act 175, 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1276). |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 824). |
2022-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 946). |
2022-05-03 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-29 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 192-22) as amended in (CD 1). |
2022-04-29 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-22. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 192-22). |
2022-04-29 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Wildberger, Costales; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 016. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 016. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 016. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, Kitagawa, Wildberger Co-Chairs; Costales, Ward. |
2022-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 873). |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Moriwaki Chair; Kanuha Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2022-04-14 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 871). |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 621). |
2022-04-12 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-08 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1985-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso, McDermott. |
2022-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-05-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2022-03-24 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1407-22) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-03-21 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-21-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-18 | House | Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1142-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2022-03-16 | House | The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Costales, Eli, Ichiyama, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Mizuno. |
2022-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 03-16-22 9:00AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to GVR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 211) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2773) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2179) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chang. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-22 3:00PM; CR 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |