HI SB2386 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain small purchase construction projects from the procurement code.
Title
Relating To Procurement.
Sponsors
Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] |
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2181) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Chang. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-22 3:00PM; CR 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |