HI SB2385 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Referred to HLT/HUS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 26
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes restrictions on sugar-sweetened beverages and certain other beverages served in child care facilities. Takes effect on 7/1/2017. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sugar-Sweetened Beverages Restriction; Child Care Facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-10HouseReferred to HLT/HUS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 26
2016-03-10HousePass First Reading
2016-03-08HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 150) in amended form (SD 1).
2016-03-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Transmitted to House.
2016-03-04SenateDeferred until 03-08-16.
2016-03-03SenateOne Day Notice 03-04-16.
2016-03-03SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2522) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2016-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Kidani, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman, Slom.
2016-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 02-26-16 10:30AM in conference room 229.
2016-02-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH.
2016-02-08SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2054) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH.
2016-02-02SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Riviere, Green, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom.
2016-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-16 1:15PM in conference room 016.
2016-01-25SenateReferred to HMS, CPH.
2016-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2016-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1674 (Same As) 2016-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro, Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1).

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback