HI SB2381 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Disability and Communication Access Board to develop and publish accessibility standards for electronic information technology for individuals with disabilities by December 31, 2022. Requires each state entity to revise its existing procurement and development rules, policies, and procedures to incorporate the accessibility standards within six months of publication. Effective 12/31/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Technology Access For Individuals With Disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported from HMS/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2486) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Ihara, Acasio, Misalucha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS/GVO, WAM. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS/EET/GVO, WAM. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Accessibility
Disability and Communication Access Board
Electronic Information Technology
Individuals with Disabilities
Disability and Communication Access Board
Electronic Information Technology
Individuals with Disabilities