HI SB2381 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a school's principal to close the school without consulting the complex area superintendent in the event of an emergency created by a natural disaster if the principal deems it unsafe for students and faculty. (SB2381 HD1)
Title
Relating To School Closures.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] |
Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; Espero. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Cullen Co-Chairs; Hashem, Ward. |
2018-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 555). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 406). |
2018-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1815-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Nakamura, Todd; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson, C. Lee, Souki, Todd excused (5). |
2018-03-22 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1278-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-14 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kong, Creagan, Learmont, Ohno, Quinlan, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Ing, McKelvey. |
2018-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-14-18 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 166) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2716) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-18 10:08AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2196) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Dela Cruz, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-18 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |