HI SB238 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB238

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Includes candidates for the board of trustees of the office of Hawaiian affairs to receive a maximum in public funds up to fifteen percent of the expenditure limit for each election. Amends ballot requirements to display candidates for the office of Hawaiian affairs board of trustees, by residency and nonresidency requirements and to randomize the order of candidate names within those groupings. Effective 7/1/3021. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Office Of Hawaiian Affairs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-25HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Branco voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2021-03-25HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1447) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-03-16HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi.
2021-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-03-11HouseReferred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22
2021-03-11HousePass First Reading
2021-03-09HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 175) in amended form (SD 2).
2021-03-09SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-03-04Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21.
2021-03-04SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 648) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2021-02-17SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-17-21 10:00AM; Via Videoconference.
2021-02-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2021-02-05SenateReported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 17) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2021-02-02SenateThe committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
2021-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-25SenateReferred to HWN, JDC.
2021-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB238 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Branco voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback