HI SB2373 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-04 - (H) Referred to WLO, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 37
Pending: House Water, Land, & Ocean Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-04 - (H) Referred to WLO, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 37
Pending: House Water, Land, & Ocean Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the imposition of fees for a future transfer of real property. Specifies exceptions. Eff 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Real Property; Transfer Fees
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | (H) Referred to WLO, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 37 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 140) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Bunda). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2615) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Bunda, Gabbard, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Takamine. | |
2010-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO will hold a public decision making on 02-19-10 11:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JGO. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2296) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JGO. | |
2010-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Ige, Espero, Green, Ihara, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Sakamoto. | |
2010-02-05 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-10-10 9:00am in conference room 229. | |
2010-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 02-05-10 9:00am in conference room 229. | |
2010-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has rescheduled its public hearing to 2/3/2010 8:30:00 AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-10 9:00am in conference room 229. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Referred to CPN, JGO. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Introduced. |