HI SB2362 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (H) Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - (H) Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the director of finance to issue general obligation bonds to finance capital improvements to various irrigation systems. (SD1)
Title
Irrigation; General Obligation Bonds; Appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 161) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) One Day Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2582) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 14 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-12 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-17 | (S) Reported from AGL/WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2294) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WLH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda. | |
2012-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kahele, Kouchi, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Shimabukuro, Slom. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL will hold a public decision making on 02-09-12 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH will hold a public decision making on 02-09-12 1:20PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-01-30 | (S) The committee(s) on AGL/WLH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-12 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Re-Referred to AGL/WLH, WAM. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to AGL, WAM. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |