HI SB236 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB236
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to TRE/CPH, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to TRE/CPH, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Transportation and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and sets forth procedures for impounding a motor vehicle or moped after a person has been fined three or more times for operating a vehicle without a valid certificate of inspection, or for operating a vehicle without being duly licensed, without a valid insurance card, or without a valid insurance policy.
Title
Relating To Motor Vehicles.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRE/CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-13-17 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-17 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to TRE/CPH, JDL/WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB236 (Carry Over) 2017-02-09 - The committee(s) on TRE/CPH deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-13-17 1:20PM in conference room 225.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=236&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB236_.HTM |