HI SB2359 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Re-Referred to LBR, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires employers to provide a minimum amount of paid sick leave to employees to be used to care for themselves or a family member who is ill or needs medical care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Labor.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-26SenateRe-Referred to LBR, WAM.
2018-01-22SenateReferred to LBR/CPH, WAM.
2018-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-01-19SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1727 (Same As) 2018-04-27 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-18 3:00 pm in conference room 329.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback