HI SB2354 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-31 - The committee(s) on AGL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-04-14 2:55PM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-31 - The committee(s) on AGL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-04-14 2:55PM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a specific listing of the geographic origins of various Hawaii-grown coffees and the geographic or regional origins of the various coffees not grown in Hawaii that are included in a coffee blend to be listed on the front panel of a label. Permits the aggregate per cent by weight of foreign grown coffees to be listed in lieu of a list of each of the geographic origins of the coffees not grown in Hawaii.
Title
Coffee; Hawaii-grown Coffee; Labeling; Geographic or Regional Origins
Sponsors
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 02-04-14 2:55PM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-14 2:55PM in conference room 229. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to AGL, CPN. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2354&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB2354_.HTM |