HI SB2350 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 8:30AM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 8:30AM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a task force within the Department of Health to identify therapies and home- and community-based care services that may benefit persons having fetal alcohol spectrum disorders, including therapies and treatments that may benefit them as adults. Requires the task force to recommend any necessary policy changes, rule changes, or legislation to increase access to these therapies and services. Requires a report to the Legislature. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2020-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-17-20 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 217) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3087) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 6 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Shimabukuro. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-20 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2768) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-20 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |