HI SB2349 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires all state correctional facilities to allow family members to engage in contact visitation with inmates at any state correctional facility during official visiting hours. Provides that the correctional facility shall provide each inmate with the opportunity for a minimum of two in-person, contact visits per week, with each visit lasting at least one hour. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Criminal Justice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseThe committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2020-03-09HouseBill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 03-11-20 10:30AM in House conference room 430.
2020-03-09HouseReferred to PVM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
2020-03-05HousePass First Reading
2020-03-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 216) in amended form (SD 1).
2020-03-03SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-02-28SenateOne Day Notice 03-03-20.
2020-02-28SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3233) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-24SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
2020-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-20 12:00PM in conference room 016.
2020-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2020-02-14SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2736) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2020-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella.
2020-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-20 1:35PM in conference room 229.
2020-01-23SenateReferred to PSM, JDC.
2020-01-21SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback