HI SB2344 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 280, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1383).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 280, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1383).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation for the Hawaii health authority. (CD1)
Title
Appropriation; Hawaii Health Authority
Sponsors
Sen. David Ige [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | (S) Act 280, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1383). | |
2012-07-10 | (H) Act 280, on 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1383). | |
2012-05-08 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-05-04 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 728). | |
2012-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 839). | |
2012-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto excused (1). | |
2012-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 22 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Slom. 2 Excused: Dela Cruz, Hee. | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 05-03-12. | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 175-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-05-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-12. | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 175-12). | |
2012-04-30 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Chun Oakland, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ige. | |
2012-04-30 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, M. Lee, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-30 | (H) Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 829). | |
2012-04-30 | (S) Senator(s) Ige added as Co-Chair(s). | |
2012-04-29 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-30-12 9:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2012-04-26 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-12 3:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-04-25 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-12 3:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-04-24 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-12 3:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-12 3:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-04-18 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-12 3:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 755). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Green, Chair; Chun Oakland, Kidani, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Yamane, Morikawa Co-Chairs; M. Lee, Ching. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 438). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1552-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: C. Lee. | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-29-12 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Herkes, Nakashima, Pine, Tokioka excused (5). | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1132-12), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Yamane, Morikawa, Belatti, Hanohano, C. Lee, Mizuno, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Jordan, Ching, Pine. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-16-12 9:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 155) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2652) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2012-02-29 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kahele, Kim. | |
2012-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-29-12 9:15AM in conference room 211. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2181) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Baker, Chun Oakland, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Slom. | |
2012-01-24 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-12 2:45PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to HTH, WAM. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2372 (Same As) 2012-01-25 - (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 7