HI SB2340 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-21 - Referred to EGH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Government Operations and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-21 - Referred to EGH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Economic Development, Government Operations and Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a refundable ohana residential housing income tax credit for qualified taxpayers that purchase a qualified principal residence on or after April 1, 2014, and before January 1, 2016, that is payable to the qualified taxpayer in two equal installments over the immediately following two taxable years.
Title
Tax Credit; Residential Housing; New Construction; Construction Industry Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to EGH, WAM. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1592 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 2
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2340&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB2340_.HTM |