HI SB234 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB234
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-19 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the department of health for capital improvement projects related to statewide pollution control. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-19 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 53) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-19 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB234 (Carry Over) 2019-02-19 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.