HI SB2335 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 239, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1342).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - (S) Act 239, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1342).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the counties to concurrently process subdivision and special management area use permits under certain conditions to ensure that a special management area use permit is processed before final subdivision approval. (CD1)
Title
Special Management Areas; Permitting; Development; Counties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | (S) Act 239, 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1342). | |
2012-07-10 | (H) Act 239, on 7/6/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1342). | |
2012-05-08 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2012-05-02 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 720). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 831). | |
2012-05-01 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2012-05-01 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-27 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-01-12. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 97-12) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2012-04-27 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 97-12). | |
2012-04-27 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-04-27 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Coffman, Har, Kawakami, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-04-26 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-12 1:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-04-24 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-12 2:10PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-12 2:30PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-12 2:15PM in conference room 224. | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 755). | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Dela Cruz, Chair; Solomon, Espero, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Chang, Coffman, Har Co-Chairs; Kawakami, Riviere. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 436). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) C. Lee voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hanohano voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1654-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-04-04 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: C. Lee. | |
2012-04-04 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-04-12 2:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-04-04 | (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-03-12 3:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Reported from WLO/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1305-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-22 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Kawakami, Chang, Har, Ito, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Herkes. | |
2012-03-22 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Coffman, Ito, Kawakami, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Herkes. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) The committee(s) on WLO/EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-22-12 at 9:30 AM. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-21-12 11:15AM in conference room 325. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) The committee(s) on WLO/EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-21-12. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by WLO/EEP on Monday, 03-19-12 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to WLO/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 151). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-02 | (S) Deferred until 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) One Day Notice 03-02-12. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Reported from WLH/PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2476) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WLH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Solomon, Ryan, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Tokuda. | |
2012-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PGM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2012-02-16 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH/PGM deferred the measure until 02-23-12 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH/PGM deferred the measure until 02-16-12 1:20PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on WLH/PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-12 1:15PM in conference room 225. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to WLH/PGM. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |