HI SB2333 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to HSH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to HSH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Executive Office on Aging to assess progress toward the policy goals identified by the Long Term Care Commission and to formulate recommendations on how the State can meet these goals. Requires a report to the Legislature. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Long Term Care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to HSH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 206) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3112) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-20 12:40PM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from HMS/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2662) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Wakai, Fevella. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Riviere, Fevella. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-20 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1871 (Same As) 2020-02-06 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Saiki, Yamashita excused (3).