HI SB2332 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-07 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an old government roads commission to address the issue of jurisdiction between the State and the counties over disputed roads. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Highways.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee on TRS deferred the measure. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-20 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2199 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2332&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2332_.HTM |