HI SB2331 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the definition of "beer" under the State's liquor tax and liquor regulatory laws, to specify that the term includes an alcohol by volume of no less than 0.5 per cent and alcohol seltzer beverages, but excludes certain other forms of distillation. Effective 10/18/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Alcohol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-18 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1086-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2022-03-16 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Okimoto. |
2022-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 03-16-22 10:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 71). |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, Lee). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-04-22. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2736) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-22 9:30AM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2370 (Same As) 2022-01-28 - Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3