HI SB233 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB233
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-31 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-31 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that boards subject to the open meetings law shall allow oral testimony on any agenda item at the beginning of the board's agenda or meeting, provided that oral testimony shall not be limited to the beginning of a board's agenda. Specifies an exception for the legislative body of each county.
Title
Relating To Public Testimony At Open Meetings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-31 | Senate | The committee on GVO deferred the measure. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB233 (Carry Over) 2023-01-31 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.
HB114 (Same As) 2023-01-25 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
HB114 (Same As) 2023-01-25 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=233&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB233_.HTM |