HI SB2329 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Caps increases in tuition for the University of Hawaii based on the change in the State's median household income. Requires the University of Hawaii Economic Research Organization to conduct a study regarding tuition affordability and the Consumer Price Index. (SB2329 HD1)
Title
Relating To Tuition At The University Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5). |
2018-03-23 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1489-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Kong, Learmont, Ohno, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Onishi, Quinlan. |
2018-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-20-18 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2018-03-15 | House | The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-18 at 2:00 PM. |
2018-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-15-18 2:10PM in conference room 309. |
2018-03-13 | House | The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-15-18. |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-13-18 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 146) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2891) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2459) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kim, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-18 1:25PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Cap
Consumer Price Index
Median Household Income
Reduction
Study
Tuition
University of Hawaii
University of Hawaii Economic Research Organization
Consumer Price Index
Median Household Income
Reduction
Study
Tuition
University of Hawaii
University of Hawaii Economic Research Organization