HI SB2324 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 669).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 669).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes an individual who is attached to a regular employer that is not offering work to still receive unemployment insurance benefits even if that individual voluntarily or involuntarily separates from part-time employment, with or without good cause. (CD1)
Title
Unemployment Benefits; Disqualification; Part-time Work
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Clayton Hee [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Dwight Takamine [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | (S) Vetoed on 07-06-10 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 669). | |
2010-07-06 | (H) Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 431). | |
2010-06-21 | (S) Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-21-10 (Gov. Msg. No. 627) | |
2010-06-21 | (H) Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 388) | |
2010-05-03 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Ching, Finnegan, Marumoto, Pine, Thielen, Ward voting no (6) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 23 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 2 No(es): Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom. 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday, 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 115-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-23 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 115-10). | |
2010-04-23 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, M. Oshiro, Nakashima, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-23 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Takamine, Kim, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-23-10 at 3:00 pm in conference room 312. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 557). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Rhoads, M. Oshiro Co-Chairs; Nakashima, Yamashita, Ward. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 534). | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 533). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Takamine, Chair; Kim, Co-Chair(s); Taniguchi. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Deferred until 04-08-10. | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 427). | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Ching, Finnegan, Marumoto, Pine, Thielen voting no (5) and Representative(s) Bertram, Hanohano excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-06-10. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1207-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-29 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Aquino, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Har, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Finnegan, Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Awana, Sagum. | |
2010-03-25 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 03-29-10 4:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2010-03-19 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Har, Manahan, Morita, M. Oshiro, Tokioka, Ward excused (8). | |
2010-03-19 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 858-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-16 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Awana, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Saiki, Souki, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pine. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-16-10 10:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2010-03-04 | (H) Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 37 | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 121) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2010-03-02 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Hemmings, Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Tsutsui). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-02-10. | |
2010-02-26 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2524) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2010-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Tsutsui, Chun Oakland, English, Galuteria, Hooser, Kidani, Kokubun, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga, Hee, Hemmings. | |
2010-02-19 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-10 10:10AM in conference room 211. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2010-02-12 | (S) Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2316) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2010-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Takamine, Taniguchi, Bunda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Hee. | |
2010-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR deferred the measure until 02-09-10 3:00pm in conference room 224. | |
2010-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR deferred the measure until 02-02-10 2:45pm in conference room 224. | |
2010-01-25 | (S) The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-10 2:45pm in conference room 224. | |
2010-01-22 | (S) Referred to LBR, WAM. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2257 (Same As) 2010-03-19 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.