HI SB232 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB232
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-16 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the maximum civil penalty for littering from $500 to $1,000. Increases the maximum fine for the offense of criminal littering from $1,000 to $5,000.
Title
Relating To Littering.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 174). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Deferred One Day 03-09-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 664) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-17-21 10:00AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 23) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to AEN, JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB232 (Carry Over) 2021-03-16 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.