HI SB2319 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Re-referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 48
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-22 - Re-referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 48
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the composition and term length of members of the Board of Regents of the University of Hawaii. (SB2319 HD1)
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii Board Of Regents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Re-referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 48 |
2018-03-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-03-16 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1216-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-03-15 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Kong, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Learmont, Matsumoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Quinlan. |
2018-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-15-18 2:10PM in conference room 309. |
2018-03-13 | House | The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-15-18. |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 03-13-18 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to HED, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 143) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) English, Green, Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Riviere, Ruderman, Tokuda . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Ihara, L. Thielen). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2673) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-21-18 10:10AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from HRE/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2516) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) L. Thielen; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kim, S. Chang, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-18 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HRE/JDC, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |