HI SB2310 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Act 004, on 04/11/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1104).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Act 004, on 04/11/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1104).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the court from granting mutual protective orders unless separate petitions are filed.
Title
Domestic Abuse; Mutual Protective Orders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Act 004, on 04/11/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1104). |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Act 004, 04/11/2016 (Gov. Msg. No. 1104). |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 367). |
2016-03-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kong, Lowen, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Oshiro, Saiki excused (6). Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-03-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1357-16), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2016-03-18 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, Morikawa, Woodson. |
2016-03-17 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-18-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-03-10 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Say, Tokioka, Ward, Woodson excused (5). |
2016-03-10 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1020-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2016-03-01 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang. |
2016-02-26 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-01-16 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2016-02-25 | House | The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 03-01-16 at 10:00AM in room 329. |
2016-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-25-16 11:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 12 |
2016-02-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 7). |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ruderman). Transmitted to House. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 02-05-16. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2016) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-16 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1905 (Same As) 2016-03-01 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 03-03-16 2:00PM in conference room 325.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2310&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2310_.HTM |