HI SB2306 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Human Services to work with the Department of Public Safety to establish a pilot visitation and family resource center at Waiawa correctional facility. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Children And Family Of Incarcerated Individuals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee on HMS deferred the measure. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-22 1:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to PSM/HMS, WAM. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Department of Human Services
Department of Public Safety
Incarcerated Parents
Keiki Caucus
Pilot Visitation Center
Waiawa Correctional Facility
Department of Human Services
Department of Public Safety
Incarcerated Parents
Keiki Caucus
Pilot Visitation Center
Waiawa Correctional Facility
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2306&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2306_.HTM |