HI SB2301 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the term expiration of a holdover member of a board or commission at the end of the first regular legislative session following the expiration of the member's term. Requires the Governor to appoint an individual to fill all board and commission vacancies within one hundred eighty days. Authorizes the President of the Senate to nominate a successor member for a board or commission in certain circumstances. Limits holdover appointments in certain respects. Requires department heads to inform the Governor of any vacancy in any board or commission. Makes conforming amendments. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Boards And Commissions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2534) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-22 3:10PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Advise and Consent
Appointment
Boards and Commissions
Governor
Hawaii Tourism Authority
Holdover Member
Vacancy
Appointment
Boards and Commissions
Governor
Hawaii Tourism Authority
Holdover Member
Vacancy