HI SB230 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB230

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that a minor may consent to emergency shelter if a provider of no cost emergency shelter and services is coordinating with child welfare service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Minors.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-02-11SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
2019-02-11SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 177) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
2019-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-19 3:10PM in conference room 016.
2019-01-22SenateReferred to HMS, JDC.
2019-01-18SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB904 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB230 (Carry Over) 2019-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback