HI SB230 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-15 - (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Public Safety to determine the number of women who are eligible for reintegration into the community and contract with providers of gender-responsive community services to assist women in successfully transitioning back into the community.
Title
Community-based Reintegration Program
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Reported from PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 169) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-12 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PGM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Ryan. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has rescheduled its public hearing to 02-12-11 10:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-11 9:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to PGM, WAM. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=230 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/SB230_.HTM |