HI SB2299 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Re-referred to IAC, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 43
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes a naturopathic physician to prescribe and administer testosterone that is consistent with naturopathic medical practice. Clarifies that narcotic drugs and controlled substances, other than testosterone, shall not be included within the naturopathic formulary. Effective July 1, 2035. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Naturopathic Medicine.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20HouseRe-referred to IAC, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 43
2018-03-08HouseReferred to HHS, IAC, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 35
2018-03-08HousePass First Reading
2018-03-06HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 137) in amended form (SD 2).
2018-03-06SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Green, K. Rhoads, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2018-03-02Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18.
2018-03-02SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2608) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2018-02-27SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-02-23SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-18 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2018-02-12SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2018-02-12SenateReported from CPH/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2192) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2018-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda.
2018-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on CPH/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-18 12:45PM in conference room 229.
2018-01-22SenateReferred to CPH/PSM, JDC.
2018-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-01-19SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback