HI SB2290 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to PBS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 35
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Referred to PBS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 35
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits state law enforcement agencies from complying with federal immigration detainers or honoring requests for non-public information unless specifically required to do so by a warrant signed by a judge or federal, state, or local law. Takes effect 1/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Law Enforcement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to PBS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 133) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2759) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-27-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2166) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-06-18 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-18 1:35PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1994 (Same As) 2018-02-16 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy, Har, Matsumoto, McDermott, Thielen, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward voting no (8) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Subjects
Federal Immigration Enforcement
Law Enforcement Agencies
United States Customs and Border Protection
United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Law Enforcement Agencies
United States Customs and Border Protection
United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement