HI SB2288 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires employers to provide employees with written notice of the employee's shift schedule at least ten calendar days before the employee is schedule to work, under certain conditions. Takes effect 1/1/2045. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Fair Scheduling.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2287) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, S. Chang, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR deferred the measure until 02-06-18 3:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-18 2:55PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to LBR, CPH. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |