HI SB2287 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the distribution of revenues collected from the transient accommodations tax to allocate a greater portion to the special land and development fund.
Title
Relating To Conservation Funding.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | The committee on EET deferred the measure. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-20 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to EET/WTL, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2287&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB2287_.HTM |