HI SB2283 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a child care expense refundable tax credit that is equal to an unspecified per cent of the amount the taxpayer spent on eligible child care expenses during that taxable year. Defines "eligible child care expenses" as the total amount the taxpayer paid to a child care facility in the State for the care of a child who is under the age of 13 and for whom the taxpayer is entitled to a deduction under section 235-54(a), HRS. Prohibits a taxpayer from claiming both the child care expenses tax credit and the credit for employment-related expenses for household and dependent care services under section 235-55.6, HRS. Applies to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Human Services: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-13-20 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2442) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ruderman, K. Rhoads, Ihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 01-31-20 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-20 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |