HI SB2278 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 329.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits nonparticipating health care providers from balance billing patients in specific circumstances. Establishes rate calculation requirements for reimbursement of nonparticipating providers. Requires the insurance commissioner to refer certain disputes between insurers and non-participating providers to an independent dispute resolution entity for binding arbitration. Repeals 1/2/2025. Effective 1/2/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Health Insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 03-16-20 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2020-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-16-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-03-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). |
2020-03-13 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1092-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2020-03-12 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Ward. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-12-20 9:00AM in House conference room Auditorium. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 184) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3146) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-20 12:30PM in conference room 016. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2811) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-12-20 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-11-20 10:15AM in conference room 229. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-07-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2504 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Belatti, DeCoite, Har, Okimoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Subjects
Balance Billing
Binding Arbitration
Health Insurance
Nonparticipating Providers
Prohibitions
Surprise Billing
Binding Arbitration
Health Insurance
Nonparticipating Providers
Prohibitions
Surprise Billing