HI SB2276 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires drug manufacturers to notify the insurance commissioner, prescription drug benefit plans, and pharmacy benefit managers if a proposed increase in the wholesale price of certain drugs would result in a per cent or more price increase over a twoyear period. Requires the drug manufacturer to identify and report to the insurance commissioner information on certain drugs whose wholesale acquisition cost increases by a certain amount during a specified time frame. Requires the insurance commissioner to post price information on the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affair's website. Imposes fines. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Prescription Drugs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 36
2020-03-05HousePass First Reading
2020-03-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 183) in amended form (SD 1).
2020-03-03SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-02-28SenateOne Day Notice 03-03-20.
2020-02-28SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3135) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella.
2020-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-20 12:30PM in conference room 016.
2020-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2020-02-14SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2744) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2020-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella.
2020-02-11SenateThe committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-12-20 10:00AM in conference room 229.
2020-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-11-20 10:15AM in conference room 229.
2020-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-07-20 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2020-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 01-31-20 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2020-01-24SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-28-20 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2020-01-21SenateReferred to CPH, JDC.
2020-01-21SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-17SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback