HI SB2273 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires certain persons to immediately report a potential tort claim to the family court when that person has reason to believe that a child in foster custody has suffered an injury that may arise to a tort claim. Establishes procedures for the family court to follow when appointing a master to investigate a potential tort claim and when authorizing the filing of a tort claim on behalf of an injured child, including the opportunity for an injured child to obtain outside legal representation. Takes effect on 1/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Family Court.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2018-02-08SenateReported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2059) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2018-01-31SenateThe committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2018-01-26SenateThe committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 01-31-18 3:00PM in conference room 016.
2018-01-23SenateThe committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 01-26-18 2:45PM in conference room 016.
2018-01-22SenateReferred to HMS, JDC.
2018-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2018-01-19SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1885 (Same As) 2018-02-02 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Ward excused (2).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback